U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Butts v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • May 07, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.