U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Bryant et al v. Rosenberg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 22, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.