U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Ford v. Jones Logistics, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.