U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Croft v. Buzbee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Diversity]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change Venue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Diversity]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.