U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Tavas et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response in Support]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.