U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Tullos v. Tractor Supply Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.