U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Wheeler v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.