U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00206
  • Case Name: 1700 Universe, LLC v. Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • May 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.