U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sullivan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.