U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Moss v. Peanut Patch Boiled Peanuts
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set Aside Default]
  • April 24, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 02, 2025: [Entry of Default]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.