U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Pittman et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.