U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Winstead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.