U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00035
  • Case Name: James River Insuance Company v. Rapid Analytics, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.