U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Mallory v. City of Hattiesburg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.