U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Marquez v. Childress
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 07, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.