U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Metal Processors, Inc. v. Transportation Providers Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 08, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.