U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00649
  • Case Name: Waldrop v. Dixon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.