U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00485
  • Case Name: Thang v. Heer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 10, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.