U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00370
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Harrison County School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Remark]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.