U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Davis v. Matt Express, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.