U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Schroeder v. Mississippi Department of Human Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.