U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Hartzog v. Jefferson County Correctional Facility et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 05, 2025: [Partial Payment of Filing Fee]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.