U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Horner v. Iris Trucking et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • April 10, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 03, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.