U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Quince et al v. Walther Arms, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.