U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 08, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 01, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.