U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00783
  • Case Name: Little v. Eagle Express Federal Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss Case as Frivolous]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.