U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Jones v. Donavan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Order]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Opsp2]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Proceed IFP 1983]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.