U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Kinchen v. Panther II Transportation, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 02, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.