U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Williams v. McNeil et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.