U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Rutland v. Allstate Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 09, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.