U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Leland Investments, LLC v. Trans 4 Fed, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 13, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.