U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Carrier Corporation v. Character One LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.