U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Triplett v. The Kroger Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.