U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 01, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 01, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Unseal Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.