U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Miles v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.