U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fairley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.