U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Contreras v. Faircloth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 05, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.