U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Southwest Mississippi Regional Medical Center et al v. Memorial Hospital at Gulfport et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.