U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00103
  • Case Name: City of Biloxi v. United States Postal Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.