U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Nicholas et al v. Pro Transport and Leasing, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.