U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Benton v. Cook et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 12, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sever]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Deposit Funds]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.