U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00506
  • Case Name: Norris v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 28, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 16, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.