U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Haynes v. The United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Suggestion of Death]
  • April 29, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.