U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00234
  • Case Name: Broome v. Vicksburg Warren School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attachment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.