U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Graham v. Alexander Shunnarah Gulf Coast LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 12, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Joinder in Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.