U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Oliver v. Mobile Medic Ambulance Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.