U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 23, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attachment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.