U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Bonds v. Woodall et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 07, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.