U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00243
  • Case Name: Tannehill v. BFI Waste Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.