U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00242
  • Case Name: Nevels v. Trelleborg Pipe Seals Milford, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Joinder in Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 23, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.